UNITED KINGDOM - JAPAN 21ST CENTURY GROUP

Charity number: 295006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 June 2017 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 07 June 2017 127 days late Download