UNITED KINGDOM - JAPAN 21ST CENTURY GROUP

Charity number: 295006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Richardson Trustee 14 July 2015 None on record
Nigel John Talboys Trustee 22 January 2017 None on record
David Fitton CMG Trustee 17 October 2017
THE LLOYD FOUNDATION Received: On time
RT HON THE LORD MCCONNELL PC Trustee None on record
Lord Andrew David Lansley CBE PC Chair 04 November 2015
RADIX GROUP LIMITED Received: 8 days late
RT HON THE LORD JOHN ANDERSON CUNNINGHAM OF FELLING Trustee 20 June 2017 None on record
Dr John Harold Nilsson Williamson-Wright Trustee 04 November 2015 None on record
Baroness Elizabeth Jean Barker Trustee 30 October 2019
GIVE OUT Received: On time
Thomas Gwyn Reich Trustee 12 August 2021 None on record
Sir David Warren KCMG Trustee 04 November 2015 None on record
DR Lisa Cameron MP Trustee 24 February 2016
COMMONWEALTH PARLIAMENTARY ASSOCIATION (UNITED KINGDOM BRANCH) Received: On time