Trustees THE NEW MEDWAY STEAM PACKET COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 296236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Bathurst Trustee 15 March 2021
None on record
John kempton Trustee 10 September 2020
None on record
Pam Bathurst Trustee 20 August 2018
None on record
Richard Paul Halton Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
BOB STOKES Trustee 09 December 2013
SOUTHAMPTON ADVICE & REPRESENTATION CENTRE
Received: On time