DAVID SOLOMONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download