DAVID SOLOMONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 297275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Hugh Penny Trustee 09 October 2019
THE ELIZABETH HARWOOD MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
THE CORPORATION OF THE CHURCH HOUSE Received: On time
BAMPTON CLASSICAL OPERA Received: On time
LASPEN TRUST Received: On time
C4WS HOMELESS PROJECT Overdue by 39 days
HAMPSTEAD CHURCHES YOUTH COMMITTEE Received: On time
CARIS CAMDEN Received: On time
Dr Richard Solomons Trustee 04 May 1999
DR RICHARD SOLOMONS' CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE GILBERT EDGAR TRUST Received: On time
CAROL BOYS Trustee 01 February 2018
DOWN SYNDROME INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
DIANA JEAN HUNTINGFORD Trustee 18 May 2005 None on record
JEREMY JOHN RUTTER Chair 21 May 1987 None on record