CAMBERLEY GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 298421
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £543.64k £527.00k £477.98k £432.80k £355.97k
Total expenditure £467.80k £472.85k £458.11k £440.89k £366.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £57.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £63.60k £1.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £203.46k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £480.01k £291.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £36 £41 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £31.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £423.97k £411.95k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.11k £680 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.32k £3.91k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £39.71k £60.22k N/A N/A N/A