CAMBERLEY GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity number: 298421
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 July 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 August 2020 50 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 December 2019 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 December 2019 176 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download