THE UNITED KINGDOM ENVIRONMENTAL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 299498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £214.82k £195.81k £198.53k £210.32k £215.19k
Total expenditure £215.72k £213.56k £248.95k £195.03k £204.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A