BOURNE END (BUCKINGHAMSHIRE) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £136.49k £102.00k £89.27k £148.35k £151.84k
Total expenditure £109.49k £99.98k £102.01k £142.85k £144.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A