101 (CITY OF LONDON) ENGINEER REGIMENT (RICHMOND HILL) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £49.68k £48.64k £51.86k £75.27k £77.19k
Total expenditure £57.30k £53.54k £45.20k £63.17k £71.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A