101 (CITY OF LONDON) ENGINEER REGIMENT (RICHMOND HILL) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1113553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 04 April 2006: Standard registration
  • 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 06 November 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 August 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 21 April 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ROYAL ENGINEERS TA (OIL PAINTING CASE) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property