Accounts and annual returns Heath End Village Rooms Trust

Charity number: 301735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required