Financial history Heath End Village Rooms Trust

Charity number: 301735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.87k £25.57k £28.30k £29.70k £30.31k
Total expenditure £16.87k £26.38k £26.92k £20.12k £27.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.33k N/A