HEATH END VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 301735
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS JEAN PENNINGTON Trustee None on record
Rosemarie Pomroy Trustee 19 July 2017 None on record
Sarah Louise Filsell Trustee 21 February 2018 None on record
Christopher Spencer Trustee 13 February 2019 None on record
SUSAN GALE Chair 14 June 2017 None on record
Sylvia Ann Patrick Trustee 12 February 2014 None on record
WARWICK LOVEGROVE Trustee
THE LODDON VALLEY DAY CARE (RESPITE) CENTRE Charity reporting is up to date
JANETTE MARGARET HEWITT Trustee 12 March 2005
HOME-START NORTH-WEST HAMPSHIRE Charity reporting is up to date
TADLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU Charity reporting is up to date
MR TONY JEFFERY Trustee None on record
BRENDA WOODS Trustee
BAUGHURST RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION Charity reporting is up to date
PAULINE ANNE POSTANCE Trustee None on record