Financial history SHERBORNE ST JOHN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301945
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.72k £30.59k £29.11k £30.94k £21.10k
Total expenditure £27.11k £20.42k £25.01k £27.92k £13.84k
Income from government contracts £240 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A N/A £11.33k