Financial history THRUXTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301969
Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £24.60k £27.62k £28.88k £31.03k £37.24k
Total expenditure £25.65k £18.82k £29.34k £22.90k £38.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A £19.71k £12.76k