CHELMSFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 September 2017 On time Download