CHELMSFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DANYEL ROBERT HORNER Trustee None on record
Roger Cole Chair 24 July 2019
1ST BROOMFIELD SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Suzanne Ball Trustee 16 July 2015 None on record
Peter Michael Wilkes Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Leanne Teri Oscroft Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
Malcolm Taylor Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Nicola Jane Hills Trustee 22 September 2020 None on record
MR RICK BALDING Trustee None on record
Christopher John Harpley Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Andrew Neil Missen Trustee 22 July 2021 None on record
Bruce Graham Knight Trustee 30 April 2020 None on record
Alexander Leslie Wilson Trustee 24 July 2019 None on record