CHADWELL - ST-MARY SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP

Charity number: 302084
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 October 2020 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required