CHADWELL - ST-MARY SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP

Charity number: 302084
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Raven Chair 30 July 2017 None on record
Julie Spurgeon Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
Ian Spurgeon Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
Lorraine Clark Trustee 25 March 2020 None on record
Elisabeth Veitch Trustee 25 March 2020 None on record
Susan Ruth Abbott Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Raymond Peter Abbott Trustee 30 June 2017 None on record
LEONARD WHITTAKER Trustee None on record
Graham Monk Trustee 19 September 2019 None on record