14TH EASTLEIGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302230
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required