Accounts and annual returns SOUTH RUISLIP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 November 2020 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 November 2020 294 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window