The Graham Spicer Institute

Charity number: 303129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £63.67k £66.36k £73.90k £74.18k £107.03k
Total expenditure £63.95k £62.30k £58.60k £53.81k £60.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £25.00k