The Graham Spicer Institute

Charity number: 303129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernadette Dickson Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
David John Bangerter Trustee 29 January 2014 None on record
MRS S TURNER Trustee None on record
Clem Baker Trustee 27 October 2014 None on record
Pamela Suzanne Pearce Trustee 01 June 2014 None on record
John Alfred HARRIS Trustee 01 January 1995 None on record
PETER John CONEY CORNER Trustee None on record