Financial history BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity number: 303798
Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.78k £23.05k £42.73k £51.27k £18.17k
Total expenditure £11.92k £32.86k £34.27k £19.06k £19.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A