Trustees BARKING AND DAGENHAM DISTRICT SCOUTS

Charity number: 303798
Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sean Wade Chair 21 October 2020
None on record
Diana Marie McNaughton Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Michael Thomas John Tucker Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Sally Michelle Di-Menno Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Stephen Peter Foakes Trustee 21 October 2020
KING EDWARD VI'S SCHOOL AT CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
Alkesh Shah Trustee 21 October 2020
HARROW DISTRICT SCOUTS
Received: On time
GREATER LONDON MIDDLESEX WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Thomas Bever Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Stuart Bailey Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Malcolm Richard Beerling Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Adrian Alun Sinclair Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Hazel Maria Taverner Trustee 23 June 2016
NEWHAM NEW DEAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Anna Skipworth Trustee 23 June 2016
None on record
ANDREW DODKINS Trustee 10 July 2014
None on record
ANGIE WELLINGTON Trustee 20 June 2012
None on record
GILLIAN IRENE MAY Trustee
None on record
Rosemary Thompson Trustee
None on record