Trustees ST EDMUND'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Elizabeth Jane Arnold Chair 01 October 2019
THE FITZWILLIAM MUSEUM DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: 15 days late
Prof Tina Lorraine Barsby OBE Trustee 01 October 2021
LAWES AGRICULTURAL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Gitanjali Yadav Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Graham Ernest Watson Trustee 30 November 2020
None on record
Dr Gemma Burgess Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Professor Eugene Murphy Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Dr Rafia Said Mohamed Al-Lamki Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Diana Frances Wood Trustee 22 October 2018
KING EDWARD THE SIXTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL, NORWICH
Received: On time
Dr Sandra Brunnegger Trustee 22 October 2018
None on record
Dr Katharina Brett Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record
Dr JUDITH COLLIS Trustee 27 October 2011
None on record