CLEVEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 February 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 February 2017 22 days late Download