Trustees CLEVEDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 304518
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Young | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Parry | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hedley Woods | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Shaw | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Bird | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Prescott | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BARTON | Trustee | 09 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eleanor Wade | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.