LADY ALICE MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required