COPDOCK AND WASHBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAN CAVANAGH Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Sally Elizabeth Watson Chair 02 December 2019 None on record
Celia Jane Fisher Trustee 15 November 2021 None on record
Adrian Ward Trustee 20 February 2020 None on record
Laura Helen Butters Mrs Trustee 15 November 2021 None on record
FRED GREEN Trustee 24 March 2013 None on record
Deborah Tyrrell Mrs Trustee 01 October 2021 None on record
Martin William Taylor Trustee 15 November 2021 None on record
Linda Mary Sheppard Mrs Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
Douglas Howes Mr Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record