BARDWELL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 304854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.52k £11.65k £241.89k £246.19k £112.10k
Total expenditure £7.55k £9.88k £70.95k £435.71k £110.59k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.75k N/A £7.49k £20.84k