BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 08 July 2020 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required