BARTON MILLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.82k £12.09k £12.27k £12.44k £18.11k
Total expenditure £9.29k £8.39k £12.56k £11.15k £8.79k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £10.00k