Financial history EWHURST AND STAPLECROSS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.33k £11.73k £10.36k £16.13k £27.34k
Total expenditure £8.43k £10.94k £10.24k £10.00k £12.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £955 £1.20k £1.30k £12.47k £22.90k