Trustees EWHURST AND STAPLECROSS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Lyne Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
PAUL REDSTONE Trustee 13 March 2018
None on record
David Young Trustee 14 March 2017
None on record
Larry Hyett Trustee 29 June 2016
None on record
Ann Reed Trustee 15 March 2016
None on record
Elizabeth Avard Trustee 24 June 2014
None on record
Jacqui Myrna Hyett Trustee 01 June 2014
None on record
Ann Prodinger Trustee 06 May 2014
None on record