Hurstpierpoint Village Centre

Charity number: 305265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £41.90k £45.73k £43.31k £49.06k £44.47k
Total expenditure £29.43k £19.27k £35.89k £38.04k £58.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A