Governing document Hurstpierpoint Village Centre
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/02/1965 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1975 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 18/04/2005 as amended on 20 Feb 2019 as amended on 20 Feb 2019 as amended on 20 Feb 2019 as amended on 25 Apr 2019 as amended on 25 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
To promote the benefit to the inhabitants of Hurstpierpoint and neighbourhood (hereinafter called “the Area of Benefit”) without distinction of sex or political, religious or other opinions by the provision and management of a Village Centre (hereinafter called “the Centre”) for the advancement of education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Area of benefit
HURSTPIERPOINT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.