Hurstpierpoint Village Centre

Charity number: 305265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 09 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 June 2016 On time Download