Financial history HASTINGS RYE AND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305856
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £115.12k £55.13k £36.30k £0 £35.77k
Total expenditure £121.12k £82.81k £42.56k £5.46k £8.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £16.91k