Financial history WORTHING DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305916
Charity reporting is overdue by 243 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £140.21k £169.46k £178.35k £233.69k £92.74k
Total expenditure £139.02k £178.08k £177.13k £228.61k £167.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A