THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.39m £32.68m £34.10m £36.96m £53.54m
Total expenditure £45.52m £33.84m £33.76m £37.52m £54.85m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £91.00k £67.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.44m £2.13m £12.64m £14.24m £14.22m
Income - Other trading activities £10.69m £10.47m £10.34m £12.41m £12.81m
Income - Charitable activities £19.27m £8.93m £10.62m £9.70m £24.76m
Income - Endowments £1.91m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £608.00k £679.00k £514.00k £620.00k £712.00k
Income - Other £10.37m £10.48m £0 £0 £1.04m
Income - Legacies £272.00k £1.12m £528.00k £924.00k £352.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.00m £26.46m £27.74m £29.65m £45.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.53m £566.00k £6.02m £7.87m £8.87m
Expenditure - Governance £163.00k £178.00k £190.00k £340.00k £445.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.39m £0 £521.00k £659.00k £730.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £35.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £6.81m £0 £0 £0