THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Sandall Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Michael St John Ashley Trustee 05 September 2020 None on record
Michael Wood-Williams Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Olubusola Sodeinde Trustee 28 March 2020 None on record
Timothy Kidd Trustee 03 September 2016 None on record
DR ANN LIMB CBE Chair 12 September 2015 None on record
Gareth Jones Trustee 08 September 2018
GREATER LONDON NORTH EAST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Caroline Pearce Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Craig Dewar-Willox Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
David Branagh Trustee 02 September 2017 None on record
MATTHEW THOMAS HYDE Trustee 10 May 2013
THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST CORPORATION Received: On time
LEXIE SIMS Trustee 12 September 2015 None on record
Kieron Moir Trustee 12 September 2015 None on record
Elizabeth Walker Trustee 05 September 2020 None on record
Rhiannon Wells Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Ollie Wood Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
Nicola Gamlen Trustee 12 September 2015
SCOUTSCYMRU Received: On time
Graham Haddock Trustee 07 September 2019 None on record
Jane Simpson Trustee 12 September 2015 None on record
Ella McLeod Trustee 05 September 2020 None on record
Peter Daniel Oliver Trustee 05 September 2020
MERSEYSIDE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time