THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 306101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 21 January 1964: Standard registration
  • 14 January 2013: Funds received from 524651 DRIFFIELD SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION
  • 24 April 2014: Funds received from 1023773 1ST SHARPNESS (ST ANDREWS) SCOUTS
  • 01 March 2017: Funds received from 522359 SPALDING AND DISTRICT SCOUT ASSOCIATION
  • 10 March 2020: Funds received from 1082039 FLYING HIGH GANG SHOW
  • 16 February 2021: Funds received from 1040858 KEN DENHAM TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SCOUTS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property