TREVILSON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 306555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.80k £18.77k £22.72k £21.18k £21.61k
Total expenditure £30.77k £19.00k £16.25k £23.66k £19.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A