Financial history THE GIRLS' DAY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 306983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £258.70m £272.17m £263.03m £261.28m £286.02m
Total expenditure £257.47m £257.28m £254.78m £251.60m £279.81m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.85m N/A £17.19m £13.90m £15.02m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.15m £6.90m £5.37m £3.81m £3.79m
Income - Other trading activities £2.78m £3.05m £1.74m £1.46m £3.10m
Income - Charitable activities £250.34m £260.37m £253.58m £253.64m £276.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.25m £1.85m £2.34m £2.22m £2.65m
Income - Other £185.00k £0 £0 £145.00k £334.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £200.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £254.13m £253.83m £251.77m £248.87m £275.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.42m £1.68m £1.87m £1.78m £2.06m
Expenditure - Governance £232.00k £240.00k £272.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £421.00k £471.00k £805.00k £611.00k £661.00k
Expenditure - Other £1.93m £1.78m £1.14m £960.00k £2.03m