Accounts and annual returns WEST HILL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 August 2021 57 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 03 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window