Financial history WEST HILL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.16m £4.07m £4.05m £3.77m £3.88m
Total expenditure £3.89m £3.88m £4.04m £3.80m £3.83m
Income from government contracts £112.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £135.94k £30.68k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.48k £35.68k £27.54k £151.00k £33.02k
Income - Other trading activities £169.21k £181.56k £138.06k £489.60k £133.09k
Income - Charitable activities £3.96m £3.86m £3.47m £3.12m £3.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £836 £622 £2.90k £1.78k £218
Income - Other £0 £0 £406.76k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.86m £3.84m £4.00m £3.77m £3.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.12k £40.26k £32.77k £32.51k £54.62k
Expenditure - Governance £8.83k £9.09k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0