Trustees WEST HILL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Murphy Chair 08 June 2016
None on record
Jonathan Anthony Frank Marren Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Penelope Jane Prescott Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Matthew Johnathan Jensen Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Sally Georgina Sproul Trustee 14 November 2021
None on record
Duncan Sinclair Trustee 29 December 2019
None on record
Caroline Jonas Trustee 03 January 2019
None on record
Gillian Sommers Trustee 03 January 2019
None on record
Alastair Bell Trustee 06 March 2018
None on record
Mr M A Waldron Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Peter A B Taylor Trustee 25 November 2014
None on record
ANDREW SEARS Trustee
None on record