CARERS TRUST BUCKS AND MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1106745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Willis Trustee 02 December 2019
CARERS MILTON KEYNES Received: On time
Dr LESLIE DAVIES Trustee 24 July 2014
CARERS MILTON KEYNES Received: On time
MR MIKE ROWLANDS Trustee 24 July 2014
THE REDWAY SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
FRIENDS OF MILTON KEYNES HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY Received: On time
Olga McBarnett Trustee 08 November 2021
CARERS MILTON KEYNES Received: On time
Paul Foley Trustee 02 July 2018
CARERS MILTON KEYNES Received: On time
STEWART GEORGE Trustee 03 July 2017
CARERS MILTON KEYNES Received: On time